Register of Charities - The Charity Commission CONTINENCE CARE FUND

Charity number: 1053793-14
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18/12/2002, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 1ST AUGUST 2006 AND 31 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SERVICES PROVIDED BY THE CONTINENCE ADVISORY SERVICE OF SOUTH EAST ESSEX PRIMARY CARE TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 05 March 2003: Standard registration
  • 26 June 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
Other names

No other names