Accounts and annual returns HOLNE CHASE PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1097846
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 March 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 April 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 24 April 2018 On Time