Charity overview CHILDRENS CENTRE FUND
Charity Number: 1053793-16
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18/12/2002, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 1ST AUGUST 2006 AND 31 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SERVICES PROVIDED BY THE CHILDRENS DEVELOPMENT CENTRE AT SOUTH WEST ESSEX PRIMARY CARE TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 05 March 2003: Standard registration
- 26 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.