THE ROYAL PHOTOGRAPHIC SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the art and science of photography, which is enacted through an exhibitions programme, workshops and courses, lectures and events, a distinctions and qualifications programme, an annual photography awards ceremony, a Regional and Overseas structure, Special Interest Groups, and by acting as an advocate for photographers and photography.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,695,171
Donations and legacies | £62.30k | |
Charitable activities | £1.53m | |
Other trading activities | £40.82k | |
Investments | £58.88k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,882,607
Raising funds | £19.07k | |
Charitable activities | £2.86m | |
Other | £0 |
£68,429 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £19.07k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.86m |
People

30 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 January 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Hill | Chair | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Lodge | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Clive Justin Weeks | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carolyn Bloore | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria forrest | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Collins | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sebah Chaudhry | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.75m | £1.67m | £1.90m | £1.76m | £1.70m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.75m | £2.15m | £2.19m | £2.70m | £2.88m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £75.37k | £58.92k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £19.34k | £158.07k | £152.59k | £143.30k | £62.30k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £45.27k | £17.27k | £25.04k | £37.97k | £40.82k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.55m | £1.40m | £1.65m | £1.53m | £1.53m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £139.46k | £100.94k | £74.38k | £51.17k | £58.88k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £75.00k | £0 | £143.30k | £15.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.71m | £2.14m | £2.17m | £2.61m | £2.86m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £38.78k | £15.79k | £18.66k | £98.94k | £19.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £236.37k | £194.47k | £173.66k | £236.96k | £319.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £16.81k | £15.79k | £13.96k | £12.56k | £8.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.72m | £3.48m | £2.96m | £2.92m | £2.48m | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.06m | £2.76m | £3.01m | £1.71m | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £877.02k | £843.48k | £840.23k | £769.28k | £1.92m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £556.68k | £545.34k | £567.30k | £628.64k | £735.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 27 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING THEIR KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF PHOTOGRAPHY AND IN DOING SO TO PROMOTE THE HIGHEST STANDARDS OF ACHIEVEMENT IN PHOTOGRAPHY IN ORDER TO ENCOURAGE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF PHOTOGRAPHY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Royal Photographic Society
337-340 Paintworks
Arnos Vale
BRISTOL
BS4 3AR
- Phone:
- 01173164450
- Email:
- finance@rps.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window