FRIENDS OF HOLY TRINITY GOODRAMGATE, YORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We finance ways of making visits to Holy Trinity Church, Goodramgate, York (under control of Churches Conservation Trust) more pleasurable.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of York
Governance
- 05 March 2003: Standard registration
- 11 September 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.52k | £2.19k | £1.87k | £1.70k | £1.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.30k | £3.23k | £4.14k | £2.15k | £822 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 February 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 February 2023 | 379 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 OCTOBER 2002. as amended on 10 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO ASSIST IN THE CARE OF THE CHURCH OF HOLY TRINITY GOODRAMGATE, IN THE CITY AND COUNTY OF YORK IN THE INTERESTS OF THE CITIZENS OF YORK OF THE NATION AND OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN ORDER TO RESPECT ITS UNIQUE FORM AS A CHRISTIAN BUILDING OF SUCH HISTORIC AND ARCHAEOLOGICAL INTEREST AND ARCHITECTURAL QUALITY AS IT OUGHT TO BE PRESERVED ("THE OBJECTS").RCHYARD.
Area of benefit
YORK.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window