Trustees THE NEWBURY UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity Number: 1097700

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Joyce Grimditch | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carole Susan Harmer | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Peter Jarvis | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr JAYNE HIPKISS | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
JILLIAN BOSLEY | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA CAROL SWANBOROUGH | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Greville | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wardell | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Strudley | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosemarie Franklin | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Derek Stephen Child | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.