SIGNPOST YOUNG PEOPLE'S ADVICE AND INFORMATION CENTRE LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
offers advice, information and councelling to young people aged sixteen to twenty five, particulary areas of housing welfare reights and health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 14 March 2003: Standard registration
- 09 June 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SIGNPOST YOUNG PEOPLE'S ADVICE AND INFORMATION CENTRE LTD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £299.35k | £192.96k | £203.30k | £102.30k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £320.54k | £184.53k | £186.73k | £122.56k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 30 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 16 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 16 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 28 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 22 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 22 December 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 FEBRUARY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY TO ESTABLISH AND ADMINISTER FOR THE YOUNG PEOPLE OF WYTHENSHAWE AN ADVICE AND INFORMATION CENTRE FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF RELIEVING POVERTY AND DISTRESS, ADVANCING EDUCATION AND PROVIDING RESOURCES AND FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
WYTHENSHAWE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window