SMILE (PRESTON) (SELF MOTIVATION IN LASTING ENDORPHINS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are Self-Help Support Group for Chronic Pain Sufferers and work closely with the Pain Management Clinic at Royal Preston Hospital (RPH). SMILE stands for Self-Motivation in Lasting Endorphins and we ensure that Self Motivation is given a helping hand by having a weekly physiotherapy approved gentle exercise session followed by relaxation both proven methods for helping chronic pain sufferers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 21 July 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Castle | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Fletcher | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Fawbert | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Threlfall | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Libby Anderson | Trustee | 06 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ann Skellorn | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pat Livingstone | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.23k | £0 | £3.39k | £12.81k | £9.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.25k | £1.50k | £4.34k | £14.55k | £12.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED 25 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM CHRONIC PAIN AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THOSE WHO HAVE PREVIOUSLY ATTENDED PRESTON PAIN MANAGEMENT PROGRAMME, BY CARRYING OUT SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS WILL RELIEVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF NEED 2. TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE PRESTON PAIN MANAGEMENT PROGRAMME
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
81 GREENFIELD WAY
INGOL
PRESTON
PR2 3GG
- Phone:
- 07784994763
- Email:
- ADMIN@SMILEPRESTON.CO.UK
- Website:
-
WWW.SMILEPRESTON.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window