HORSHAM DEBT ADVICE SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an independent Christian charity which provides a free and confidential service to anyone experiencing financial difficulties and needing advice and practical assistance. Our team of trained advisers help them to budget and plan their finances and also assist them wherever possible by agreeing with their creditors reduced levels of repayments which they can afford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 12 August 2003: Standard registration
- HDAS (Working name)
- HORSHAM COMMUNITY DEBT ADVICE SERVICE (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Laurence Newman | Chair | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael McGrath | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Sherlock | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Robert McCulloch | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian White | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mark Colson | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Michael Richard Jones | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.93k | £16.28k | £16.25k | £11.55k | £21.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.37k | £9.37k | £12.80k | £10.96k | £11.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £500 | £1.50k | £8.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 FEBRUARY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 JUNE 2003 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 JUNE 2008 as amended on 24 May 2023 as amended on 19 Jul 1923
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST PERSONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY ANY SUCH MEANS THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AT LAW, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES, DEBT COUNSELLING SERVICES, ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND THE PROVISION OF OTHER RESOURCES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
F1 & F3 First Floor
Park House
North Street
Horsham
West Sussex
RH12 1RN
- Phone:
- 01403258040
- Email:
- advisor@hdas.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window