CLEVELAND YOUTH CLUB FOR THE SIGHT IMPAIRED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE RUN A YOUTH CLUB FOR BLIND AND SIGHT IMPAIRED CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS. WE MEET EVERY FRIDAY EVENING WHERE THE CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS CAN SOCIALISE WE ALSO TAKE THEN FOR DAYS OUT AND HOLIDAYS. WE HAVE OUR OWN MINI BUS WHICH COLLECTS THE CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS FROM THEIR HOMES AND RETURNS THEM, THE MINI BUS IS ALSO USED TO TAKE THE YOUNG ADULTS AND CHILDREN FOR DAYS OUT AND HOLIDAYS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 16 June 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Thomas | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
M/S Barbara Stainthorpe | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS STEVIE CHANTELLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £537 | £0 | £306 | £1.16k | £1.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.47k | £845 | £2.30k | £2.31k | £2.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 FEBRUARY 2003 AS AMENDED 16 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF YOUNG PERSONS UP TO THE AGE OF 18 WHO ARE VISUALLY IMPAIRED OR BLIND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAYS, SOCIAL WELFARE OR RECREATIONAL FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE GABLES WHARTON COTTAGES
MARGROVE ROAD
MARGROVE PARK
MR GUISBOROUGH
NORTH YORKSHIRE
TS12 3BU
- Phone:
- 01287653953
- Email:
- cathythomas56@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window