ROSIE'S HELPING HANDS

Charity number: 1097278
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A Trust dedicated to helping to improve the quality of life and care for children and young people within a 15 mile radius of Walsall in the West Midlands.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 December 2017

Total income: £32,959
Total expenditure: £55,338

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments and/or benefits from the charity for being a trustee

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Staffordshire
  • Walsall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 April 2003: Standard registration
  • 08 March 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ROSIE'S CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/12/2017
Total gross income £25.66k £26.63k £31.90k £24.91k £32.96k
Total expenditure £25.67k £26.21k £28.23k £25.09k £55.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 December 2017 07 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 March 2018 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2016 19 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 15 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 15 April 2016 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2014 13 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 13 April 2015 On Time