BUCKINGHAM AND AREA COMMUNITY ADVICE BUREAU FOUNDATION (BACAB)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to assist the charitable work of Buckingham Winslow and District Citizen Advice Bureau
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 18 June 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE MARGARET MORDUE | Chair |
|
||||||
Martyn Alan Thompson | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Malcolm Morton | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Grenville Richardson | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Lever | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN FANE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.25k | £15.34k | £27.74k | £15.37k | £23.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.13k | £36.85k | £25.48k | £13.61k | £25.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 February 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST THE CHARITABLE WORK OF BUCKINGHAM, WINSLOW AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU IN PROVIDING RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE TO CLIENTS AND POTENTIAL CLIENTS AND TO OTHER PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE OR ADVICE
Area of benefit
BUCKINGHAM, WINSLOW AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wheeldon House
Market Hill
Buckingham
Buckinghamshire
MK18 1JX
- Phone:
- 01280 815418
- Email:
- jane@mordue.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window