RAMSEY ABBEY WALLED KITCHEN GARDEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restoration and maintenance of a Victorian Walled Kitchen Garden
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 04 August 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER VANE PERCY | Chair |
|
||||||||
Philip Whaites | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|||||||
Esmond Edwards | Trustee | 12 January 2018 |
|
|||||||
Mark Wilkinson | Trustee | 12 January 2018 |
|
|||||||
Dr JANE SILLS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.96k | £7.97k | £11.47k | £15.25k | £23.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.75k | £7.41k | £13.33k | £15.65k | £14.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
THE PRIMARY AIM IS THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, MAINTENANCE, RENOVATION, ENHANCEMENT, ENRICHMENT, REGENERATION AND DEVELOPMENT AS NECESSARY OR ADVISABLE OF THE WALLED KITCHEN GARDEN, ITS GRADE II LISTED WALLS, ARCHES AND FEATURES OF HISTORICAL OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST LOCATED IN THE GROUNDS OF RAMSEY ABBEY SCHOOL. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE HISTORICAL AND ARCHITECTURAL VALUE OF THE WALLED GARDEN AND IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF HORTICULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE WILLOWS
RAMSEY ROAD
RAMSEY FORTY FOOT
RAMSEY
HUNTINGDON
PE26 2XN
- Phone:
- 07973380827
- Email:
- walledgardenramsey@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window