Sustainable Dorset

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Encouraging climate friendly and sustainable communities in Dorset.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
Governance
- 08 March 2004: Standard registration
- DORSET AGENDA 21 (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josef Davies-Coates | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Giles Francis Tanfield Watts | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Margaret Owen Morisetti | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Michael John Hancock | Trustee | 27 January 2018 |
|
|||||
MR MARK WORCESTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.18k | £1.66k | £1.26k | £1.08k | £2.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.24k | £2.11k | £1.78k | £2.34k | £5.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 DECEMBER 2003. as amended on 04 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATED TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE DORSET AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hawkers Farm
Hawkers Lane
Stour Provost
GILLINGHAM
Dorset
SP8 5LZ
- Phone:
- 07432573567
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window