Financial history EMMANUEL CHURCH FLEETWOOD

Charity Number: 1104595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £232.55k £261.91k £193.32k £213.76k £379.82k
Total expenditure £269.49k £204.00k £179.22k £184.41k £213.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.32k £3.09k £500 £809