EMMANUEL CHURCH FLEETWOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHURCH - Proclamation of the Christian faith and community work with particular emphasis to be involved with the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £809 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 15 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith McDonald | Chair | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Forshaw | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN THEWLIS | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terry Godfrey | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trudie Swift | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT GUINNEY | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Maurice Dowsing | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Verney Jones | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev CHRISTOPHER JOHN KELSALL | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mell | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £232.55k | £261.91k | £193.32k | £213.76k | £379.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £269.49k | £204.00k | £179.22k | £184.41k | £213.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.32k | £3.09k | £500 | £809 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED 10 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE WORD OF GOD BY THE CHURCH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH ENFORCED FROM TIME TO TIME AS PER THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE. (2) THE PROMOTION OF THE TEACHING AND THE APPLICATION OF THE STATEMENT OF FAITH AND ANY RELIGIOUS OBSERVATIONS THAT MANIFEST THE STATEMENT OF FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE FLEETWOOD
Linked charities
- 15 March 2006 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Emmanuel church
Mount Road
FLEETWOOD
Lancashire
FY7 6RE
- Phone:
- 01253770646
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window