Trustees EMMANUEL CHURCH FLEETWOOD
Charity number: 1104595

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith McDonald | Chair | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Forshaw | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN THEWLIS | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terry Godfrey | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trudie Swift | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT GUINNEY | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Maurice Dowsing | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Verney Jones | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev CHRISTOPHER JOHN KELSALL | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mell | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.