EASTERN OASIS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide freshly cooked curry lunches twice weekly Users are elders in Croydon & surrounding area who like Asian type food. We befriend clients in house & by phone,provide hot meals & some home service when people are unwell or returned from in hospital. We give care & help members fight isolation, loneliness & depression.Many social activities LB of Croydon and others providing funding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Croydon
Governance
- 11 August 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Alice Debenham | Trustee | 20 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Renee winifred Ann Swinton | Trustee | 16 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS B ADDISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR B D HOWSDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR C D'SILVA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR S K DARR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.48k | £5.40k | £8.44k | £12.21k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.54k | £851 | £1.49k | £9.31k | £889 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 DECEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED 8 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PERSONS WHO ARE LIVING IN THE BOROUGH OF CROYDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS AND OF PERSONS WHO ARE CARING FOR THEM AND ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING:- 1. TO PROVIDE MEALS FOR SUCH PERSONS; 2. TO ALLEVIATE THE LONELINESS AND ISOLATION OF SUCH PERSONS BY PROVIDING DAY CARE, A BEFRIENDING SERVICE, AND CULTURAL, SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES; 3. TO PROVIDE INFORMATION, ADVICE, AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS, THEIR FAMILIES OR CARERS; 4. TO PROVIDE RESPITE CARE TO RELIEVE THE FAMILIES AND CARERS OF ELDERLY PERSONS, AND BY SO DOING IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THE ELDERLY PERSONS AND FOR THEIR CARERS; 5. TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH INTO THE NEEDS OF ELDERLY PERSONS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, IN PARTICULAR THE NEEDS OF ETHNIC MINORITY ELDERS, AND TO DEVELOP SERVICES TO MEET THESE NEEDS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF CROYDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 WOODCOTE GROVE ROAD
COULSDON
CR5 2AL
- Phone:
- 02086832996
- Email:
- shkdarr@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window