BURMA FORCES WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The BFWA was formed to provide financial aid to the Burmese soldiers who fought with the British Armed Forces against the Japanese during the second world war. These fighting men have been forgotten by successive UK governments and are not supported within Burma. The BFWA aim is to ensure the remaining Burmese old soldiers spend the last years of their lives with dignity and honour.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
- Burma
Governance
- 21 January 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lizann Peppard | Trustee | 17 February 2015 |
|
|||||
david herring | Trustee | 17 February 2015 |
|
|||||
john peppard | Trustee | 17 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENISE SHERRY SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75 | £0 | £1.10k | £1.03k | £1.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £403 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 March 2022 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 March 2022 | 494 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE RELIEF OF PERSONS LIVING IN BURMA, AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO SERVED IN THE ARMED FORCES RAISED IN BURMA PRIOR TO THE INDEPENDENCE GAINED BY THAT COUNTRY IN 1948 AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, WHO ARE IN NEED BY VIRTUE OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS OR OLD AGE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tyringham Hall
Upper Church Street
Cuddington
Aylesbury
HP18 0AP
- Phone:
- 01844291526
- Email:
- PHILJOHNSONPEN@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window