Financial history SOUTHWARK TIGERS RUGBY CLUB

Charity number: 1107439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £32.06k £39.05k £44.41k £38.22k £35.84k
Total expenditure £16.75k £25.12k £49.12k £52.52k £35.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £19.29k £8.67k N/A N/A