Financial history MOSSLEY HILL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1098349
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £73.77k £63.77k £67.80k £64.89k £64.22k
Total expenditure £54.83k £55.42k £62.40k £65.39k £68.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £60.10k N/A N/A N/A N/A