WINCHESTER THEATRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity's aims and objectives is to own and safeguard the Theatre Royal Winchester building on behalf of the communities of Winchester and the county of Hampshire. The building is held in trust as an Asset of Community Value. The Charity is lessor to the tenant - Play to the Crowd (charity)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 03 September 2003: Standard registration
- WINCHESTER ARTS TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAIN HARFIELD STEEL | Chair | 10 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Annabel Louise Evans | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hatem Ezzat Nabih | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Russell | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.35k | £62 | £62 | £18 | £53 | |
|
Total expenditure | £544 | £1.40k | £1.86k | £780 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 April 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 April 2024 | 426 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 10/02/2003, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 26/05/2009 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 1/07/2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8/06/2010 AND REG'D AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 7/07/2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED (THE "OBJECTS") ARE RESTRICTED TO CULTIVATING AND IMPROVING PUBLIC TASTE IN THE ARTS AND PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION THEREIN BY PRESENTING OR ASSISTING (WHETHER BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OR SUBSIDIES OR OTHERWISE) IN THE PRESENTATION OF PROFESSIONAL OR AMATEUR WORK OF MERIT IN THE VISUAL ARTS OR PERFORMING ARTS IN THE CITY OF WINCHESTER.
Area of benefit
WINCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Theatre Royal
22-23 Jewry Street
Winchester
SO23 8SB
- Phone:
- 07976722499
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window