Trustees HUMBER LEARNING CONSORTIUM
Charity number: 1097333

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Jennings | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew Edmund Gerald Jonas | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Nicholson | Trustee | 10 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Benton | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Paul Betts | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE DARNELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.