ROMA SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We realise the Roma Support Group's aims and objectives by the following activities: A) Advice and advocacy for young people, their families and older Roma; B) Health projects; C) Education support project; D) Sport inclusion project; E) Art and culture development projects; F) Roma culture workshops; G) Roma training schemes; H) Policy and information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £88,991 from 2 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 May 2004: Standard registration
- RSG (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROZA KOTOWICZ | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Bernadetta Hodczak | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Glowacki | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danuta Solecka | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Tarnoky | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dragica Felja | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Czibi | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHARON ELLIOTT | Trustee | 17 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANTHEA WORMINGTON | Trustee | 29 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR THOMAS ACTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHAELA JAROSINSKA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CORNEL REZMIVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER NORTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £352.27k | £495.44k | £381.50k | £432.21k | £414.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £351.77k | £346.90k | £387.52k | £406.86k | £465.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £48.31k | £54.21k | £37.48k | £56.72k | £88.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 JAN 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 APR 2004 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF FREE ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO ROMA PEOPLE AND OTHER PERSONS WHO, FOR REASONS OF POVERTY WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH ADVICE. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE ROMA AND OTHER PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT ROMA ARTS, CULTURE AND HISTORY. 4. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE MANOR PARK, UPTON PARK AND WHITE CITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 23610
LONDON
E7 0XB
- Phone:
- 07949089778
- Email:
- info@romasupportgroup.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window