BLUE VENTURES CONSERVATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Blue Ventures is a science-led social enterprise that works with coastal communities to develop transformative approaches for nurturing and sustaining locally led marine conservation initiatives. We work in places where the ocean is vital to local people, cultures and economies, and where there is a fundamental need to support human development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£16,519,444
Donations and legacies | £16.50m | |
Charitable activities | £18.32k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £1.01k |
Total expenditure:
£14,323,494
Raising funds | £488.00k | |
Charitable activities | £13.80m | |
Other | £39.67k |
£804,631 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,632,968 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £527.66k | |
Charitable expenditure | £13.80m | |
Retained for future use | £2.20m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £527.66k | |
Charitable expenditure | £13.80m | |
Retained for future use | £3.00m |
People

286 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 8 |
£70k to £80k | 5 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£350k to £400k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Belize
- Comoros
- East Timor
- Indonesia
- Kenya
- Madagascar
- Mozambique
- Philippines
- Senegal
- Tanzania
Governance
- 07 August 2003: Standard registration
- 25 August 2015: Funds received from 1118505 MARINE EDUCATION TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dougal Adam Freeman | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAM GOOD | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Meg Adhiambo Otieno | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip James | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruma Mandal | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rupen Patel | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Mary Holmes | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Everett | Trustee | 31 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Averill | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.06m | £9.82m | £29.49m | £11.94m | £16.52m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.15m | £6.83m | £9.83m | £14.58m | £14.32m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.75m | £1.71m | £1.54m | £1.86m | £1.63m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £191.80k | £9.76m | £29.31m | £11.25m | £16.50m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £298.49k | £0 | £11.87k | £6.91k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.52m | £800 | £94.94k | £270.04k | £18.32k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.55k | £198 | £9.72k | £408.14k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £42.35k | £58.72k | £67.79k | £3.07k | £1.01k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.00m | £6.65m | £9.34m | £14.09m | £13.80m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £142.02k | £152.20k | £417.03k | £474.99k | £488.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £67.63k | £57.55k | £101.29k | £113.04k | £232.13k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £1.40m | £2.76m | £4.60m | £3.40m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £26.02k | £76.89k | £23.80k | £39.67k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £449.76k | £421.28k | £413.22k | £956.57k | £527.60k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £21.52m | |
|
Other assets | £4.34m | £6.85m | £27.02m | £24.46m | £6.49m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £324.74k | £412.61k | £916.91k | £1.56m | £1.67m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/02/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (A) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AND THE PROMOTION, ORGANISATION AND SUPPORT (FINANCIAL AND OTHERWISE) OF RESEARCH EXPEDITIONS FOR THE EXPLORATION OF CORAL REEF AND OTHER MARINE ECOSYSTEMS IN REMOTE AND UNDEVELOPED REGIONS OF THE EARTH FOR THE PURPOSES OF ADVANCING KNOWLEDGE OF OR RESEARCHING INTO SAID MARINE ECOSYSTEMS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; (B)THE PROMOTION OF THE SUSTAINABLE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: 1)THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES IN COASTAL AREAS OF DEVELOPING COUNTRIES; AND 2)THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; (C)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF COASTAL COMMUNITIES IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES REGARDING MARINE ECOSYSTEMS AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; AND (D)THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. IN THE OBJECTS "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OFF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS".
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Basement Floor
Save The Children
1 St. John's Lane
London
- Phone:
- 0203 875 8980
- Email:
- info@blueventures.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window