SWANSEA CHILDREN'S THERAPY CENTRE SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides support to children with special needs and their families. Funding day trips e.g to the pantomine, specialist equipment, activity days e.g.rock climbing and themed parties e.g. at christmas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 08 September 2003: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY CHILDREN'S PHYSIOTHERAPY CENTRE SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIA CLAIRE NAWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.63k | £3.50k | £0 | £247 | £86 | |
|
Total expenditure | £928 | £4.49k | £338 | £794 | £813 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 03 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 JANUARY 2002 AND 18 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CHILDREN, IN THE DISTRICT OF SWANSEA, WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED BY THEIR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES (INCLUDING CEREBRAL PALSY AND OTHER ASSOCIATED MEDICAL CONDITIONS) BY SUCH MEANS AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE DETERMINE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST EQUIPMENT AND TOYS FOR USE IN PHYSIOTHERAPY AND OCCUPATIONAL THERAPY (SUCH THERAPY BEING UNDERTAKEN BY APPOINTED HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS OF THE LOCAL HEALTH SERVICE TRUST).
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF SWANSEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAFAN Y MOR
SINGLETON HOSPITAL
SKETTY
SWANSEA
SA2 8QA
- Phone:
- 01792200400
- Email:
- chairman@swanseact.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window