Accounts and annual returns DHARMARATNA BUDDHIST CENTRE

Charity Number: 1100757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 09 December 2024 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 30 October 2023 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 23 October 2022 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 31 October 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 09 November 2020 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required