ALKBOROUGH JULIAN'S BOWER FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintains the Ancient Monument known as Julians Bower, which is a turf maze. It is open to the public free of charge at all times.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 27 March 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN DAVID WHITE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
NEIL VESSEY | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MALCOLM ROBERTS | Trustee | 02 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN SPENCER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8 | £16 | £16 | £52 | £57 | |
|
Total expenditure | £651 | £0 | £0 | £720 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2025 | 348 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 March 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 FEBRUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
TO USE THE INCOME FROM THE PERMANENT ENDOWMENT OF ú15,000 FOR THE SOLE USE OF THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE PIECE OF LAND WHICH IS THE ALKBOROUGH MAZE ALSO KNOWN AS JULIAN'S BOWER SITUATED IN ALKBOROUGH, NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE, FOR THE BENEFIT, ENJOYMENT AND RECREATIONAL PURPOSES OF THE COMMUNITY AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND ALL THOSE PEOPLE THAT USE AND ENJOY THE MAZE. THIS TRUST IS TO THEREFORE UPHOLD AND ENHANCE THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE MAZE, AND MAINTAIN AND PRESERVE THE MAZE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
ALKBOROUGH, NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Witham Drive
Burton-upon-Stather
SCUNTHORPE
DN15 9YF
- Phone:
- 01724721695
- Email:
- alkboroughpc@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window