HINDSFORD COMMUNITY LINK LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide quality lowcost childcare for local community children. We follow the Early years foudation guidlines for education as set out by the Government.All grants given by local goverment for 3 &4 yrs old is spend on giving the children the best possible start and equipment for their Early years,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wigan
Governance
- 16 July 2003: Standard registration
- 21 February 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 21 February 2012: Funds transferred to 1134399 HINDSFORD COMMUNITY LINK (NW) LIMITED
- HCLL (Working name)
- HINDSFORD DAY NURSERY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.60k | £197.44k | £224.00k | £256.69k | £264.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £177.79k | £189.35k | £228.75k | £259.63k | £270.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 16 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 04 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 19 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 03 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 14 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 13 January 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE QUALITY DAY CARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY AGE. OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHTS OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF THE GROUPS. THE CHARITY WILL ENSURE ALL SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES TO CHILDREN REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION OR MEANS. THE COMMUNITY ROOM IS TO BE USED FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HINDSFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Area of benefit
HINDSFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window