SLOUGH COMMUNITY TRANSPORT & SHOPMOBILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of community transport, shopmobility and essential services for such of the inhabitants of Slough and its neighbourhood who are in need of such services because of age, sickness or disability, or poverty or because of a lack of availability of adequate and safe public passenger services. This is met by the provision of a transport service (passengers or assistance to non passengers).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £313,477 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Slough
Governance
- 10 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eleanor Cryer MBE | Chair | 01 June 2014 |
|
|||||||
Richard Minegard | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Mercedes Martinez Monroy | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £416.48k | £437.43k | £366.95k | £333.82k | £416.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £396.02k | £399.35k | £415.64k | £412.81k | £467.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £267.36k | £299.85k | £258.54k | £264.61k | £313.48k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 09 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF SLOUGH AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL), OR POVERTY, OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES.
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS OF SLOUGH AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
SLOUGH COMM TRANS & SHOPMOBILITY
UPTON HOSPITAL
ALBERT STREET
SLOUGH
BERKSHIRE
SL1 2BJ
- Phone:
- 01753536273
- Email:
- sctsgeorge@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window