ARABIC SPEAKING WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide: support, advice, advocacy/referrals, - emotional and social relief for users who are in condition of need (hardship and distress -practical assistance (filling forms/passports, writing letters/C Vs and comm with GPs, Tel companies, Gas, Elec, Banks. For social inclusion, we organise one trip / year paid by members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAILA MAHMOUD IMBABI ISMAIL BSC MSC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Khadija Ferras | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Hadia Girshab | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
NOURAH RASHID | Trustee | 28 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SAMIRA ABDELKAFI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIHAM ABI-NADIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FATIMA QOUDIHA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.10k | £930 | £930 | £380 | £90 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.18k | £2.35k | £2.21k | £1.49k | £168 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 April 2021 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 JULY 2001 AS AMENDED 3 AUGUST 2003.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES OF REFUGEES SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST IN THEIR REHABILITATION WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY 2) TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS LIVING IN WALTHAM FOREST AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS 3) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS 4) TO PROMOTE INDIVIDUAL AND FAMILY HEALTH AND WELL BEING THROUGH PROVISION OF EMOTIONAL AND SOCIAL SUPPORT AND HEALTH AWARENESS' SEMINARS 5) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
WALTHAM FOREST AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Diana Road
Walthamstow
LONDON
E17 5LE
- Phone:
- 07957540115
- Email:
- aswawfb@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window