SEVERNDROOG CASTLE BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the education of the public by preserving for the benefit of the people of the London Borough of Greenwich and of the nation the historical, architectural and constructional heritage that may exist in the building known as Severndroog Castle and its environs, it being of particular historical, architectural or constructional interest
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,203 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Greenwich
Governance
- 05 December 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Joseph Nickson | Chair | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Roberts | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Catterall-Young | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dario Cracco | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yasmin Bennaim Kuska | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Alfred Myat | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Wilkinson | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rania Abdul Rahman Hafez | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Anthony Goode | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Emma Sweeney | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Elizabeth Winsall | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARY THERESE BRIGHT | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.51k | £91.17k | £46.41k | £42.07k | £137.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.34k | £67.26k | £51.03k | £65.27k | £139.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.00k | £33.35k | £4.48k | £2.06k | £4.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 187 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PRESERVING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH AND OF THE NATION THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST IN THE BUILDING KNOWN AS SEVERNDROOG CASTLE AND ITS ENVIRONS, IT BEING OF PARTICULAR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
THE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Severndroog Castle
Shooter's Hill
London
SE18 3RT
- Phone:
- 0742910400
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window