Accounts and annual returns ST PAUL'S CENTRE WORTHING, COMMUNITY PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 1097454
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 October 2019 On Time