Financial history ST PAUL'S CENTRE WORTHING, COMMUNITY PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 1097454
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £244.14k £295.02k £314.13k £427.42k £388.21k
Total expenditure £271.31k £326.14k £343.37k £443.34k £442.73k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A