LITTLEPORT AND DISTRICT PATIENTS & USERS, LENDERS OF SPECIAL EQUIPMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of medical equipment to the local medical centre, and help and support with limited medical equipment as required by members of the community. LOCAL MEDICAL PRACTICE: The equipment supplied has to date been diagnostic and life support equipment allowing minor surgery not supplied by the local PCT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Cambridgeshire
- Norfolk
Governance
- 11 July 2003: Standard registration
- 23 March 2017: Funds received from 273778 LITTLEPORT DAY CENTRE APPEAL FUND
- P.U.L.S.E. (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR GEOFF NORMAN | Chair |
|
||||||
Alison Bowles | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Kerridge | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Val Padgett | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Carew | Trustee | 11 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
THERESA ANN BIDWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID PORTER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.96k | £9.49k | £5.97k | £8.20k | £6.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.41k | £10.37k | £6.15k | £5.69k | £9.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 May 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON 6TH MAY 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF OLD AGE, SICKNESS AND DISABILITY BY THE SUPPLY/PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY SUPPLIED BY THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE.
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGES SUPPORTED BY ST GEORGES MEDICAL PRACTICE. LITTLEPORT, SOUTHERY, SHIPPY HILL, LITTLE DOWNHAM AND LOCAL HAMLETS IN CAMBRIDGE NORTH AND NORFOLK WEST
Contact information
- Address:
-
22a New River Bank
Littleport
Ely
CB7 4TA
- Phone:
- 01353861516
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window