O DDRWS I DDRWS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation's current activities is to provide an affordable community transport service for the needs of the elderly, the sick and disabled and disadvantaged people within the community of Pen Llyn. We have over 450 recorded clients, a team of voluntary drivers, our own full-time and one part-time driver and two wheelchair accessable vehicles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £116,863 from 3 government contract(s) and £116,863 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 June 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Glyn Parry | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geraint Jones | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Delia Roberts | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Evans | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Angela Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Gareth Tudur Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HYWEL WYN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Medwyn Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Roger Jones | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.47k | £145.16k | £186.74k | £369.00k | £284.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £191.27k | £125.10k | £159.55k | £262.90k | £284.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £116.86k | |
|
Income from government grants | £57.82k | £68.62k | £121.86k | £217.48k | £116.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 16 JANUARY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LLYN COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL), OR POVERTY, OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES.
Area of benefit
THE LLYN COMMUNITY, DWYFOR IN THE COUNTY OF GWYNEDD
Contact information
- Address:
-
DRWS AGORED
NEFYN
PWLLHELI
GWYNEDD
LL53 6HP
- Phone:
- 01758721777
- Email:
- wil@oddrwsiddrws.cymru
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window