Financial history HALL GREEN INFANT AND JUNIOR SCHOOLS HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1097037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 12/10/2020 12/10/2021 12/10/2022 12/10/2023 12/10/2024
Total gross income £5.51k £3.21k £1.80k £2.15k £2.09k
Total expenditure £1.93k £7.50k £844 £4.82k £1.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A