NOTTINGHAM WEST OUTREACH CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Outreach Church exists to advance the Christian religion, and to further the work of the Church and the Assemblies of God. It provides a place of worship and other community activies that are of benefit to children, adults, elderly and those with disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 06 May 2003: Standard registration
- 02 December 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- KIMBERLEY COMMUNITY CHURCH (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.38k | £33.43k | £41.10k | £65.14k | £64.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.15k | £56.19k | £47.51k | £63.01k | £64.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 12 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 19 October 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 30 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 30 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 13 November 2007 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 13 November 2007 | 13 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 31 October 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION WITH TRUST DEED ADOPTED 16 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED BY A RESOLUTION DATED 12 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST THE LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD BY THE CHURCH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FUNDAMENTAL TRUTHS OF ASSEMBLIES OF GOD IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND AS APPROVED BY THE GENERAL COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME...
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window