SOUTH DOWNS PLANETARIUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote - science & technology particularly to children of all ages and the public understanding of science to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 04 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN ELIZABETH MILLS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT KIRK BA | Trustee | 15 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
DR JOHN WILLIAM MASON MBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.25k | £62.86k | £77.50k | £91.54k | £131.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.18k | £91.06k | £130.23k | £93.10k | £93.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £47.00k | £45.30k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JANUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SCIENCE OF ASTRONOMY AND ALLIED SCIENCES, PARTICULARLY BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY THE PROVISION OF A PLANETARIUM IN CHICHESTER.
Area of benefit
CHICHESTER, WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
SIR PATRICK MOORE BUILDING
KINGSHAM FARM
KINGSHAM ROAD
CHICHESTER
WEST SUSSEX
PO21 8RP
- Phone:
- 07818297292
- Email:
- sdownsplanet@proton.me
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window