CONFERENCE ON CRACK AND COCAINE COCA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 April 2003: Standard registration
- 12 April 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2005 | 30/06/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £364.46k | £115.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £367.58k | £124.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, INCLUDING ORGANISATIONS WORKING WITH DRUG ABUSE, HEALTH AUTHORITIES, GENERAL PRACTITIONERS ETC, IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO DRUG ABUSE AND THE PROBLEMS SURROUNDING ILLICIT DRUG USE, IN PARTICULAR CRACK COCAINE WITH A VIEW TO RELIEVING THE MENTAL PHYSICAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL ILL HEALTH OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM SUCH A DEBILITATING DEPENDENCY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window