SHINE (SHARE HOLDING IN NURSERY EDUCATION) AFRICA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teacher Training Continuation of maintenance of buildings Emergency Funding e.g. food and medical costs Provide Educational and medical Equipment Pay Gambian staff wages Send boxes of school and medical supplies plus clothing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- The Gambia
Governance
- 27 April 2004: Standard registration
- 13 February 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SHINE AFRICA (Working name)
- Paying staff
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.47k | £5.04k | £2.15k | £1.25k | £708 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.20k | £3.50k | £1.20k | £1.00k | £700 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2025 | 356 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION OF 12 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN AFRICA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND MATERIAL ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window