Financial history LAVERSTOKE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1098108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £244.56k £1.85k £705 £96 £2.38k
Total expenditure £11.04k £45.60k £7.06k £2.01k £1.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A