HELPING HANDS IN EASTERN EUROPE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide practical and financial support to people and organisations in Romania which are supporting the homeless, educating minority groups in health care and family planning and in the building of a hostel for homeless women or battered wives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 February 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Romania
Governance
- 31 July 2003: Standard registration
- 09 August 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2005 | 12/02/2006 | 12/02/2007 | 12/02/2008 | 12/02/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.13k | £5.08k | £3.28k | £1.65k | £2.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.93k | £5.43k | £2.96k | £1.97k | £1.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 February 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 12 February 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 12 February 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 12 February 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 12 February 2009 | 06 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 February 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 February 2008 | 01 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 February 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 FEBRUARY 2003 AS AMENDED ON 14 JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING IN EASTERN EUROPEAN COUNTRIES BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND MANUAL ASSISTANCE CALCULATED TO RELIEVE SUCH NEEDS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY OFFERING SUPPORT AND GUIDANCE TO MISSIONARIES, AND OTHER PEOPLE, WISHING TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS TEACHING.
Area of benefit
EASTERN EUROPE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window