Jepun Indonesia in UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Jepun Appeal fundraise in the UK to help children in need in Indonesia. This year we distributed our funds to Darul Aitam orphanage on Java, TK Buntu Tawan in Toraja Central Celebes, and to Solidaritas Perempuan Anging Mamiri who worked in Palu Central Celebes post the devastating Palu earth quake and tsunami. All three organisations are known as small grassroot charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
- Hertfordshire
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Indonesia
Governance
- 28 July 2003: Standard registration
- JEPUN BALI APPEAL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAYA MOURANI FAIRRIE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Conny Irawati Hesse | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MINETTE BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMALIA MAYAWATI BARTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/10/2019 | 25/10/2020 | 25/10/2021 | 25/10/2022 | 25/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £406 | £1.19k | £0 | £0 | £1.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £396 | £1.26k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 October 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 October 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 October 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 October 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 NOVEMBER 2002 as amended on 20 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND ADVANCEMENT OF SCHOOL EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN IN NEED IN BALI, INDONESIA, WHOSE PARENT OR PARENTS OR GUARDIAN ARE, FOR REASONS OF POVERTY, UNABLE TO PAY FOR THE CONTINUATION OF EDUCATION UP TO THE COMPLETION OF SENIOR HIGH SCHOOL LEVEL IN THE INDONESIAN SYSTEM, GIVING PRIMARY PREFERENCE TO THE BENEFICIARIES DESCRIBED BELOW: [BENEFICIARIES - (1) TO GIVE PRIMARY PREFERENCE TO THE CHILDREN OF THE VICTIMS OF THE BALI BOMB TRAGEDY IN INDONESIA ON 12 OCTOBER 2002 WHOSE PARENTS WERE EITHER KILLED OR SEVERELY WOUNDED AS A DIRECT RESULT OF THE BOMB AND TO GIVE SECONDARY PREFERENCE, TO THE EXTENT THE TRUSTEES CAN AFFORD, TO THOSE INDONESIAN CHILDREN IN NEED OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO CONTINUE THEIR EDUCATION, WHERE THEIR CONTINUED SCHOOLING IS CURTAILED AS A RESULT OF THE PRIMARY WAGE EARNER OF THEIR HOUSEHOLD BEING UNABLE TO WORK OF ILL HEALTH OR SEVERE ECONOMIC MISFORTUNE AS A DIRECT OR INDIRECT RESULT OF THE BALI BOMB TRAGEDY]
Area of benefit
BALI, INDONESIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 ASTWOOD MEWS
LONDON
SW7 4DE
- Phone:
- 02072440777
- Email:
- jepunappeal@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window