Financial history SOUTH WEST GOLDEN RETRIEVER RESCUE TRUST

Charity number: 1100305
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £118 £35.03k £0 £0 £84.37k
Total expenditure £1.28k £4.25k £197 £478 £3.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A