NATIONAL AQUARIUM LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate the public and promote the conservation of marine and freshwater aquatic organisms by the provision of an aquarium.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Hampshire
- Plymouth City
- Japan
- Malaysia
Governance
- 11 July 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Roberts | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BENJAMIN COX | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.91m | £1.19m | £2.29m | £5.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.51m | £954.00k | £1.81m | £0 | £648 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.91m | £1.19m | £2.29m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.21k | £1.81k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.48m | £942.14k | £1.80m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £26.36k | £11.86k | £6.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £667 | £3.87k | £667 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £10.84k | £9.00k | £6.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 01 December 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/06/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/04/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN AND PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF LIVING MARINE AND FRESH WATER AQUATIC ORGANISMS AND IN PARTICULAR THROUGH PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INCLUDING THE SUSTAINABLE USE OF THE OCEAN'S RESOURCES AND THE EFFECT OF MAN'S ACTIVITIES THEREON AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NATIONAL MARINE AQUARIUM
ROPE WALK
PLYMOUTH
PL4 0LF
- Phone:
- 01752275203
- Website:
-
national-aquarium.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window