Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BRACKEN LEAS

Charity number: 1097128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 26 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 03 June 2024 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 08 July 2023 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 June 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required