Financial history RUGBY FOOTBALL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1100277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £24.52m £23.90m £19.79m £23.44m £24.76m
Total expenditure £25.08m £14.69m £19.14m £24.47m £25.58m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £24.11m £23.57m £19.38m £23.44m £24.76m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £337.03k £413.23k £434.11k £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £418.20k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £25.08m £14.69m £19.07m £24.42m £25.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £216 £216 £68.44k £48.21k £108.69k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £12.20k £8.49k £15.32k £25.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0