THE SUSAN DOBSON MEMORIAL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To recognise and encourage women's business and entrepreneurial achievements in the North East of England, as a contribution to promoting industry and commerce for the public good.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 30 July 2004: Standard registration
- 14 October 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 05/04/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.46k | £5.75k | £4.89k | £343 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.50k | £2.50k | £2.50k | £5.00k | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2011 | 30 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 02 February 2011 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 AUGUST 2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 25 APRIL 2004.
Charitable objects
2.1 TO PROMOTE INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE FOLLOWING COUNTIES OF ENGLAND: NORTHUMBERLAND, TYNE & WEAR, DURHAM, AND CLEVELAND ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"); AND IN PARTICULAR TO FURTHER THIS OBJECT BY A) THE CREATION AND FUNDING OF PRIZES AND AWARDS FOR WOMEN IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO RECOGNISE AND ENCOURAGE THEIR BUSINESS AND ENTREPRENEURIAL ACHIEVEMENTS; B) THE CREATION AND FUNDING OF PRIZES FOR MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC TO ENCOURAGE THE SUPPORT OF WOMEN'S BUSINESSES AND ENTREPRENEURIAL ENTERPRISES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2.2 FOR SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE TO BE FITTING TO THE MEMORY OF SUSAN DOBSON.
Area of benefit
IN THE COUNTIES OF NORTHUMBERLAND, TYNE & WEAR, DURHAM, AND CLEVELAND.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window