SHERWOOD ARCHERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Target Archery Club with access for shooting available 365 days per year to members. We offer Have a Go sessions and Beginners courses to all ages and abilities, both male and female, by prior arrangement. These are supervised by Archery GB qualified coaches, who are also available to help club members wishing to improve their standard of shooting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 09 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Woods | Chair | 11 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Burton | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Moran | Trustee | 10 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Waterfield | Trustee | 10 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Sykes | Trustee | 11 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Lamb | Trustee | 11 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Pauline Burton | Trustee | 24 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Smith | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARIO VITTORIO STANKOVIC | Trustee |
|
||||||
Susan Ann STANKOVIC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ANN STANKOVIC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.11k | £14.03k | £29.57k | £31.41k | £33.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.11k | £14.03k | £22.99k | £22.31k | £19.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.52k | N/A | £9.42k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JANUARY 2003 AS AMENDED 08 FEBRUARY 2009 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2015 AS AMENDED ON 11 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED ON 22 MAY 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY EXERCISE AND RECREATION THROUGH THE PRACTISE OF ARCHERY IN ALL ITS FORMS APART FROM BOW HUNTING. 2. TO INTRODUCE ARCHERY TO INTERESTED MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN ORDER TO WIDEN THE APPEAL OF THE SPORT AND TO ENCOURAGE EVENTUAL PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY EXERCISE AS IN (1) ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Fairlawns
MANSFIELD
Nottinghamshire
NG18 3EP
- Phone:
- 07803 123138
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window